+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to Last Calendar
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/11/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to last calendar
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/11/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/28/2014
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor