+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 941
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/29/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/23/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/2/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 21, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 29, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 23, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 2, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 23, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor