+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/10/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/6/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/4/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 1/29/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 4, 2014: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE
January 29, 2014: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor