+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 23
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 2
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 5/2/2017
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Local Government Committee to 5/2/2017
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/25/2017
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
May 4, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
May 4, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
May 2, 2017: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 2, 2017: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor