+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 546
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/18/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 2/18/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/11/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/5/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0682
Amendment 1-0 to HB1439
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2014: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
February 5, 2014: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor