+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Hall Income Tax Calendar
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2016
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.