+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study in State Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
- Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction