+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction