+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 671
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/1/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 9, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 1, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor