+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 902
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 91, Nays 0
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/15/2014
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. adopted am. #1
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 2
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0624)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/25/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/12/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/4/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0624
Amendment 1-0 to HB1429
+ − Votes (8)
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 91
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
March 13, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
February 19, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
February 12, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
February 4, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor