+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
- Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor