+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2016
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/6/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/30/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/16/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Civil
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 22, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor