+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 738
- Effective date(s) 04/07/2016
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0540)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0576)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/18/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/16/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 2/16/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/9/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/3/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/3/2016
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 1/27/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
February 22, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92