+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 6
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 3, PNV 0
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2017
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 10, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
April 10, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 28, 2017: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 28, 2017: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor