+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 515
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate Amendment #1 withdrawn.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0162)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0433)
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2021
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0227)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0103)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0090)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/6/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/9/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (8)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92