+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/20/2014
- Reset on Regular cal. for 2/20/14
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/10/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/6/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/5/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 1/29/2014
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- Re-ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 1/22/2014
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0610
Amendment 1-0 to HB1405
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 5, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
January 29, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor