+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 284
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/11/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Action def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 4/11/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/4/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.