+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 369
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/13/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Health Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to Vaccine Calendar
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration -- Health Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction