+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor