+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 270
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/24/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/16/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 29, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2021: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
March 16, 2021: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor