+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 491
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/9/2017
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0285)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0637)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll 2 places
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0291)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0360)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0430)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Roll 2 places
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/4/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
- Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (12)
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
May 9, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 9, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
May 8, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 8, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 8, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
May 8, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 4, 2017: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 4, 2017: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 29, 2017: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
March 29, 2017: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor