+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 1, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
March 25, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor