+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Education
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction