+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/17/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/17/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/10/2015
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 17, 2015: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor