+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 612
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/13/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/25/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 2/25/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/18/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 2/18/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/11/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/4/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0773
Amendment 1-0 to HB1372
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
February 4, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor