+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/5/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/25/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee--Government Operations for review
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 25, 2014: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor