+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2022
- Pub. Ch. 400
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3, PNV 1
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0245)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 6
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0278)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/7/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 26, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
April 20, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 14, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 7, 2021: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 30, 2021: HOUSE HIGHER EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor