+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study in Infrastructure Subcommittee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee to 3/26/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor