+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 7
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/25/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/12/2013
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97