+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
March 24, 2015: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor