+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
- Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/3/2021
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
- Meeting Canceled
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor