+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 545
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 5
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 6, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reset on next avail. cal.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/21
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Held on desk.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/24/2021
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/24/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/17/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Sponsor change.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 27, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 6
April 5, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 24, 2021: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2021: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor