+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Def. to Summer Study in Local Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 19, 2019: HOUSE CITIES & COUNTIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor