+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 453
- Effective date(s) 06/14/2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 91, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1330
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0382)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0249)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 4/3/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 97
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
April 15, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 3, 2019: HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 20, 2019: HOUSE K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor