+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 313
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
April 10, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 3, 2019: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor