+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/9/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to last calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/19/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 3/19/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/19/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/13/2013
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.