+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/14/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/7/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor