+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.