+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 5/26/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor