+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- Reassigned to Civil Justice Committee
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.