+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 318
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/1/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 1, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 1, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 24, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
March 24, 2015: BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor