+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/12/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Banking & Investments Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 5, 2019: HOUSE BANKING & INVESTMENTS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor