+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Tabled
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/13/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 2/13/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 1/30/2018
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Failed for lack of second in: State Government Committee
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/25/2017
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/25/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/18/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/12/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
- Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2017: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
April 12, 2017: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor