+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 189
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0092)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0057)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/16/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
- Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
- Ref. to Commerce Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 22, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 22, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 16, 2021: HOUSE COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2021: HOUSE BANKING AND CONSUMER AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor