+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 303
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/16/2019
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/2/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 35
April 10, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 2, 2019: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 27, 2019: HOUSE PUBLIC HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor