+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 03/31/2021
- Pub. Ch. 80
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0041)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0005)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/2/2021
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/23/2021
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/16/2021
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 15, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 8, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 2, 2021: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 23, 2021: HOUSE PROPERTY & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor