+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 918
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next calendar
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2014
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/19/2013
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0908
Amendment 1-0 to HB1279
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor