+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 143
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/22/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
March 22, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 10, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 2, 2021: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor