+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 423
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/2013
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed Behind the Budget
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/2/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/26/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 18, 2013: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 2, 2013: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
March 26, 2013: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE
March 20, 2013: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor