+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 593
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 5/3/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Action def. in Government Operations Committee to Next Calendar
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/26/2021
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/20/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/20/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/13/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 4, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 3, 2021: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
May 3, 2021: HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
April 20, 2021: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
April 6, 2021: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor